Refine your search

Showing 7 of 7 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
10/08/2008 Became Public Law No: 110-354.
10/08/2008 Signed by President.
09/30/2008 Presented to President.
09/27/2008 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S10018)
09/25/2008 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H9912)
09/25/2008 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 110-889.
02/16/2007 Introduced in House