Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 09/24/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 09/25/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/01/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/15/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 11/05/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 11/05/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 11/09/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 11/09/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 11/09/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 11/15/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/15/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 11/15/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/15/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 12/04/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 12/04/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 12/04/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/04/2007