There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Reclamation Wastewater and Groundwater Study and Facilities Act to increase the ceiling on the Federal share of the costs of phase I of the Orange County, California, Regional Water Reclamation Project.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
06/05/2007Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5942)
02/16/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber
08/01/2007SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power. Hearings held.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power
07/17/2007SenateStar Print ordered on the bill.
06/07/2007SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
06/05/2007-3:01pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/05/2007-3:01pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5942)
06/05/2007-2:59pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1175.
06/05/2007-2:59pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5942)
06/05/2007-2:59pmHouseMrs. Christensen moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
02/26/2007HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water and Power.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
02/16/2007HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
02/16/2007HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 02/16/2007

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources02/16/2007 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power02/26/2007 Referred to
Senate Energy and Natural Resources06/07/2007 Referred to
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power08/01/2007 Hearings by

No related bill information was received for H.R.1175.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1175. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (06/05/2007)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Amends the Reclamation Wastewater and Groundwater Study and Facilities Act to specify the ceiling on the federal share of the costs of phase I of the Orange County, California, Regional Water Reclamation Project for FY2007-FY2016.