Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/06/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/15/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/15/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/21/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/30/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/30/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/30/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/30/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 03/30/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 03/30/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 03/30/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/30/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/30/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/30/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 03/30/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 03/30/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 03/30/2007
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/30/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 04/20/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/20/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 04/20/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 04/20/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/08/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/21/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/25/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/27/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/27/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/09/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/09/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/14/2008