Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/01/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/01/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/10/2007
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 04/09/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/15/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/29/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/29/2008
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/29/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/29/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 04/29/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/01/2008
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 05/01/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/01/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/14/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/14/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/14/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/14/2008
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 05/20/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/21/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/22/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/22/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/22/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/03/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/03/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/03/2008
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/12/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/18/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/18/2008
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/23/2008
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 07/08/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/08/2008
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 07/10/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/10/2008
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 09/18/2008