Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/01/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/01/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/01/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/01/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 03/01/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/01/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/01/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/05/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/08/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/12/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/22/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/26/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/17/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/17/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/17/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/09/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/09/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/09/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/09/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/09/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/09/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/10/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/10/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/10/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/10/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/17/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/17/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/17/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/17/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/17/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/17/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/06/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/06/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 06/06/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/06/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/06/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/06/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/06/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/06/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/06/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/06/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/06/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/06/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/06/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/06/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/06/2007
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/11/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 06/18/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/18/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/10/2008