Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/27/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/01/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/01/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/01/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/01/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/09/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/09/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/09/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/09/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/21/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/21/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/21/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 03/21/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/21/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/21/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/21/2007
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/29/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 03/29/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/29/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/20/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 04/20/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 04/20/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/20/2007
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/20/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/20/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/20/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/20/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/20/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/20/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/20/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 04/20/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/01/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/01/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 05/01/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/01/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/01/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 05/08/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/08/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/08/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/08/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 05/08/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 05/08/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/08/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/08/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/14/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/14/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/14/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/14/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/14/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/14/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/14/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/14/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/14/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/24/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/24/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/24/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/24/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/24/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/24/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/24/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/24/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/24/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/24/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/24/2007
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/24/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/24/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/07/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/07/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/07/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/07/2007
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 06/07/2007
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 06/07/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/07/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 06/07/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/07/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/07/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/07/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/07/2007
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 06/07/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/07/2007
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 06/13/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/13/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/13/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/13/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/15/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/15/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/15/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/15/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/15/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/22/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/22/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/22/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/22/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 06/22/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/27/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 06/27/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 06/27/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/27/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 06/27/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/28/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/19/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/19/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 07/19/2007
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 07/19/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 07/19/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/19/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/19/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/19/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 08/02/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 08/02/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 08/03/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/07/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 09/07/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/07/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/07/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/10/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 09/10/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 09/27/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/27/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/27/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 09/27/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/27/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/27/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 09/27/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/27/2007
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 09/27/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/10/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/10/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 10/10/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 11/15/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 11/15/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 11/15/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 11/15/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 11/15/2007
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 11/15/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 11/15/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 12/18/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 12/18/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 12/18/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 12/18/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/13/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 04/30/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/30/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 05/21/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/21/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/21/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/22/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/22/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/04/2008
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/05/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/05/2008
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/05/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/05/2008
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/09/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/12/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/12/2008
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 06/20/2008
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 07/08/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/09/2008