Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 02/27/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 02/27/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 02/27/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/27/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/27/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 02/27/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/07/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 04/20/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/20/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/24/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/24/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/14/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/14/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/14/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/22/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/05/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/05/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/05/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/05/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/11/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 07/11/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 08/03/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 09/04/2007
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 09/04/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/20/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/20/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/26/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/26/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/23/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/31/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 10/31/2007
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 10/31/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/31/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 11/06/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 11/06/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 11/06/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 11/06/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 11/15/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 12/11/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 12/13/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 01/28/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/04/2008
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 03/04/2008
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/12/2008