Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 02/27/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/27/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 02/27/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/27/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/09/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 03/09/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/09/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/09/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/22/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 03/22/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/24/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/05/2007
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/05/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/28/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/10/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/19/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/19/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 08/03/2007