Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/15/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/20/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/26/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/26/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/26/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/26/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/17/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/17/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/17/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/17/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/17/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/17/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/17/2007
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 04/17/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/17/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 04/17/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 04/17/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/17/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/17/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/02/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/02/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/16/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/16/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/24/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/24/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/24/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/24/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 06/05/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/15/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/22/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/22/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/28/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/18/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 08/01/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 08/01/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/07/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/10/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/27/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/23/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 11/15/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 12/04/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 12/05/2007