Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/19/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/19/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/19/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/19/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/19/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/19/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 03/19/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/19/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/19/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/19/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/19/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/19/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/19/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 03/19/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 03/19/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/19/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/19/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/19/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 03/19/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/19/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 03/19/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/19/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/19/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 03/19/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/19/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/19/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/19/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/19/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/19/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/19/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/19/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/19/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/19/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/19/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/19/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/19/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 03/19/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/21/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/21/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/21/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 03/21/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/26/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 03/26/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/26/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/27/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/27/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/27/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/17/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/17/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/19/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 04/19/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/19/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/19/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/23/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/23/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 04/23/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/23/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/23/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 04/23/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 04/25/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/25/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/30/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/30/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/01/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/09/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/09/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 05/09/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/14/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/14/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/14/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/16/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 05/16/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/17/2007
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 05/22/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/22/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/22/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/23/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/24/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/24/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/05/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/05/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/06/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/07/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 06/12/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/13/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/10/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 07/18/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/18/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 07/18/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/10/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/19/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/24/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/02/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 10/04/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 10/09/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 10/12/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 10/16/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 10/18/2007
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 10/24/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 11/01/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 11/05/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 11/06/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/06/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 12/04/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 12/04/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 12/04/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 12/10/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 12/19/2007
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 01/15/2008
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 01/15/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 01/15/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/04/2008
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/04/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 03/11/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/02/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/08/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/17/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 05/08/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/22/2008
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 06/04/2008
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/04/2008
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 07/29/2008