There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Focus on Family Health Worldwide Act of 2007

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Foreign Assistance Act of 1961 to improve voluntary family planning programs in developing countries, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/28/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
02/28/2007Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/28/2007Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (61)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/01/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/01/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/08/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/09/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/09/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/19/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/19/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/22/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/22/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/22/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/26/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 03/28/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/16/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/16/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/16/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/16/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/16/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/16/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/16/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/16/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/16/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/16/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/17/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/17/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/19/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/24/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/25/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/02/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/02/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/02/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/02/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/08/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/14/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/14/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/15/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/15/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/16/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/17/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/23/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/23/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/06/2007
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/14/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/18/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/25/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/10/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/04/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/04/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/10/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/18/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/18/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/20/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/24/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT-5] 11/13/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/13/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 12/13/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 01/23/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 02/06/2008

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs02/28/2007 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1225.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1225. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/28/2007)

Focus on Family Health Worldwide Act of 2007 - Amends the Foreign Assistance Act of 1961 to authorize the President, through the United States Agency for International Development (USAID), to provide assistance for voluntary family planning programs in developing countries, including activities to: (1) improve public knowledge of voluntary family planning programs; (2) support public and private voluntary family planning programs, including networks for community-based and subsidized commercial distribution of contraceptives; (3) expand training for health care providers and educators; (4) provide improved coordination between voluntary family planning programs and programs that receive U.S. assistance for the prevention of HIV/AIDS and other sexually transmitted infections; and (5) strengthen supply chain logistics for the procurement and distribution of safe contraceptives, including coordination with the supply chain for HIV/AIDS prevention, care, and treatment.

Gives priority to developing countries with acute family planning and maternal health needs.