Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/09/2007
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 03/09/2007
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 03/09/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/09/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/09/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/09/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 03/09/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 03/12/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/12/2007
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 03/12/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/12/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/12/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/12/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/14/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/14/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 03/22/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/22/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/22/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/29/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/29/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 03/29/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 03/29/2007
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 04/26/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 04/26/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/26/2007
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 04/26/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/26/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/26/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/26/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/07/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/07/2007
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 05/24/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 05/24/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/24/2007
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 06/05/2007
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 06/05/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/14/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/28/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/11/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 07/11/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/26/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/26/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/26/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 08/02/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 08/02/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 08/03/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 09/20/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/20/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 09/20/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 10/01/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 10/02/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 10/17/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 12/12/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 02/06/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/31/2008