Committees: H.R.1236 — 110th Congress (2007-2008)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform02/28/2007 Referred to
09/20/2007 Markup by
House Oversight and Government Reform Subcommittee on Federal Workforce, Post Office, and the District of Columbia03/27/2007 Referred to
09/18/2007 Reported by
09/18/2007 Markup by
House Energy and Commerce02/28/2007 Referred to
10/25/2007 Reported by H. Rept. 110-409
10/16/2007 Markup by
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health03/01/2007 Referred to
10/10/2007 Reported by
10/10/2007 Markup by
House Armed Services02/28/2007 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Terrorism, Unconventional Threats and Capabilities03/28/2007 Referred to
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs11/01/2007 Referred to
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs Subcommittee on Federal Financial Management, Government Information, Federal Services, and International Security12/12/2007 Referred to