Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/06/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/13/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/13/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/15/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/27/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/27/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/29/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/23/2007
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/01/2008