Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/28/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/09/2007
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/09/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/09/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/09/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/09/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/09/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/09/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 03/23/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/23/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/23/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 03/23/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/17/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 04/17/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 04/17/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/17/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/19/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/24/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/01/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 05/01/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/01/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/01/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/02/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/03/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/07/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 05/08/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/15/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/15/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/16/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/23/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/24/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/24/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/24/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/24/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/05/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 06/11/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/20/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/20/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/20/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/21/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/25/2007