Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/13/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 03/04/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/04/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/14/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/14/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/14/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/10/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/30/2008