Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 03/05/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 03/05/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/05/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/05/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 03/05/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/05/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/05/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/05/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 03/05/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/05/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/05/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/05/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 03/05/2007
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 03/06/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 03/06/2007
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 03/06/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 03/06/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/06/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/06/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/06/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/06/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/06/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/06/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/07/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 03/07/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 03/07/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/09/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/09/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/09/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 03/09/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/09/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/12/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/15/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/15/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/15/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/15/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 03/19/2007
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 03/19/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 03/21/2007
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 03/21/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/21/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/22/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 03/22/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/27/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/29/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 03/29/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/29/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 03/29/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/29/2007
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/29/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/29/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/29/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 03/29/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/29/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/29/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 03/29/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/29/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 03/29/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 03/29/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/16/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/16/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/17/2007
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 04/17/2007
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 04/17/2007
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 04/18/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/18/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 04/18/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/20/2007
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 04/24/2007
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 04/24/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/24/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/01/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/01/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/01/2007
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 05/09/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/09/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/15/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 06/11/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 06/11/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 06/11/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/11/2007
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 10/09/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 01/17/2008
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 02/06/2008