Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/29/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/29/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/29/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/29/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/17/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/17/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/17/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/24/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/24/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/24/2007
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/02/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 05/09/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/15/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/19/2007
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/19/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/25/2007
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 10/01/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 02/26/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/26/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/05/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/05/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/12/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/13/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/13/2008
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 03/14/2008
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 04/01/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/01/2008
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 04/01/2008
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/01/2008
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/01/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/02/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 04/03/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/03/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/08/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 04/09/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/14/2008
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/22/2008
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 04/30/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/30/2008
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/12/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/26/2008