Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 03/01/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/19/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/19/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/19/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/19/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/19/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/19/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/19/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/19/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/19/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/23/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/23/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/23/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 03/23/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/23/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 03/27/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 03/27/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 03/27/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/21/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/21/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/05/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/26/2007
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/12/2008