Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 03/29/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/29/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/29/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/29/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/29/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/29/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/29/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/29/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/29/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/29/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/29/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 03/29/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/29/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/23/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/23/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/23/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/23/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 04/23/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/23/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 04/23/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/23/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/23/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/23/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/23/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/02/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/24/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/24/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/24/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/24/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/20/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/20/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 06/20/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/20/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/28/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/28/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/10/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/11/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/12/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/16/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/19/2007
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 07/26/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/30/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/30/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 08/01/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 08/04/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/04/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 09/04/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/04/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/04/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/04/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/06/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/07/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/10/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/17/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/19/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/19/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/19/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/19/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/19/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/20/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/27/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 10/02/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/10/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/15/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/15/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/16/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/17/2007
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 10/17/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/17/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/18/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/25/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 10/30/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/05/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 11/14/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 11/14/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 11/15/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 12/05/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 12/10/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/03/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/11/2008