Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/05/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/05/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/05/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/05/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/05/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/07/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/07/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/07/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/07/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/07/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 03/07/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/07/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/26/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/26/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/29/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/16/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/17/2007