Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/07/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/21/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/22/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/26/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/14/2007