Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 03/01/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 03/01/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 03/01/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 03/01/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 03/07/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/07/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/07/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/07/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/09/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/09/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/14/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/14/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/14/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 03/14/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 03/14/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/20/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/20/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/20/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 03/20/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/20/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/29/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 03/29/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/29/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 03/29/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/29/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 04/17/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/17/2007
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 04/17/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/17/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/17/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/17/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/17/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/17/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/17/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 04/18/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 04/18/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/18/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/23/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/23/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/23/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 04/23/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 04/23/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 04/23/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 04/23/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/25/2007
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 04/25/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/01/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/01/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/01/2007
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 05/01/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/01/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/01/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/03/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/07/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/07/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 05/08/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/08/2007
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 05/10/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/10/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/10/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/10/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/15/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 05/15/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/15/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/15/2007
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 05/15/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/17/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/22/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/22/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/22/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/22/2007
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/22/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/22/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/23/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/23/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 05/23/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/23/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 05/23/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/23/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/24/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 05/24/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/24/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 05/24/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/24/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/24/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/24/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/24/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 06/06/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/06/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/06/2007
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 06/06/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/06/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/06/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/12/2007
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/12/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/12/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/12/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/12/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 06/12/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/12/2007
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 06/12/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 06/20/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/20/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/20/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/20/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 06/20/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/27/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 06/27/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/27/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/23/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 07/23/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 07/23/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 07/23/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 07/23/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/23/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 07/23/2007
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 07/23/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/31/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/31/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/04/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/04/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 09/17/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/24/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 09/24/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/24/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/24/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 09/26/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/27/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/09/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 10/09/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/22/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 10/25/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 10/25/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/30/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 11/06/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 11/15/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 12/04/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 12/12/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 12/12/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 12/19/2007
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 01/28/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/06/2008
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/05/2008
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 04/08/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/15/2008
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/24/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/29/2008
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 06/26/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 07/10/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 09/09/2008