Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 06/11/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 06/11/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 06/11/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/12/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/12/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 06/13/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/27/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 07/19/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/03/2007
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 10/04/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 10/04/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 10/04/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/04/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 10/04/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 10/23/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/24/2007
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 10/29/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 10/29/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 10/31/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 11/05/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/09/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 11/09/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 11/15/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 12/12/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 01/28/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/26/2008
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 02/26/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/26/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 02/26/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/03/2008
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 03/11/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 03/13/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 03/14/2008
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/14/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/01/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 04/01/2008
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 04/01/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/08/2008
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 04/14/2008
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 04/14/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/14/2008
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/14/2008
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/14/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/17/2008
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 04/22/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/24/2008
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 05/06/2008
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/04/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/09/2008
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/25/2008
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/08/2008
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 07/08/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/29/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 09/08/2008
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/16/2008
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 09/24/2008