Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/05/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/05/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 03/09/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/27/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 12/13/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/19/2007
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/11/2008