Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 03/01/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/01/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 03/01/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 03/01/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/01/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/01/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/01/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 03/01/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/12/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/12/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/12/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/16/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 04/16/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/18/2007
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 04/18/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 05/01/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/01/2007