Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/23/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/23/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/23/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/23/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/23/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/23/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/23/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 03/23/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/23/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 03/23/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/23/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/23/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/23/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/23/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/23/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/23/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/23/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/23/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/23/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/23/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/23/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/23/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/23/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/23/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/23/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/23/2007
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/23/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/23/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/23/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/23/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/27/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/27/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 03/27/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/27/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 03/27/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/27/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/29/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/29/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/29/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/29/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/29/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/18/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/18/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/18/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/18/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/18/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/18/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/25/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/25/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/25/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/25/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/25/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/03/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 05/03/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 05/16/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 05/16/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/16/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 05/16/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/16/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/24/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/24/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/07/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/19/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/19/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 06/19/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/19/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/19/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/19/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 07/12/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 07/12/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/12/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/17/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 07/24/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/30/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/30/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/31/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/31/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/31/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/31/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 08/03/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 08/03/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/18/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/24/2007