Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/05/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/05/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/05/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/05/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/06/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/06/2007
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 03/06/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 03/12/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/13/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/14/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/19/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/19/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/21/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/27/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/27/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 03/27/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/28/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/23/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 05/01/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/01/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/03/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/09/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/23/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/07/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 06/12/2007
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/11/2007
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 07/11/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/05/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/05/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 09/05/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/06/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 09/06/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/06/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/07/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/10/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 09/14/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 09/17/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/24/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/27/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 10/12/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/13/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/15/2008
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 04/24/2008
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/11/2008