Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 03/08/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/09/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 03/09/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 03/19/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/19/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/17/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/01/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/01/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 05/01/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 05/01/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 05/01/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/02/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 05/02/2007
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 05/02/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/08/2007
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/08/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 05/08/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/10/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/10/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 05/14/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/14/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/14/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 05/14/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/15/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 05/15/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 05/15/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/15/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 05/15/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/15/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 05/17/2007
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 05/17/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/17/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 05/17/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/22/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/22/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 05/22/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/22/2007
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 05/22/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/22/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 05/22/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/24/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 05/24/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/06/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 06/06/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/06/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 06/06/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/06/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/06/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 06/06/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/11/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/11/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/11/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 06/11/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/11/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/11/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/14/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 06/27/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/27/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/27/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/28/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/11/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/12/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 07/17/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 07/17/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/17/2007
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 07/17/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/17/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 07/24/2007
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/25/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 08/01/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 08/02/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 08/03/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/07/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/07/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/20/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/18/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 10/18/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/30/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/30/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 11/06/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 11/15/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 12/04/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 12/04/2007
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 12/13/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 12/13/2007
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 01/23/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/04/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/19/2008
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/03/2008