Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/23/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 09/25/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 10/04/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/07/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/07/2008