Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/07/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/07/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/07/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 03/07/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/07/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 03/07/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/07/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/08/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/08/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 03/08/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/08/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/08/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 03/08/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 03/08/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 03/08/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/08/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/08/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 03/08/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 03/09/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/09/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 03/09/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/09/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/09/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/09/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 03/09/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/09/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 03/13/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/13/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/15/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/15/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 03/19/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/20/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/20/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/20/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/20/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/20/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 03/20/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/20/2007
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/20/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/20/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 03/20/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/20/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/20/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 03/20/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/20/2007
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/20/2007
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 03/20/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/21/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/21/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 03/26/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/26/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 03/26/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 03/26/2007
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 03/26/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/27/2007
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/27/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 03/27/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/19/2007
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 04/19/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/01/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/01/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/14/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/14/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/21/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/21/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/24/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/14/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/20/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 10/04/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 10/18/2007
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 11/06/2007