Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/05/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/05/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/05/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/05/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/19/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/19/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/19/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/18/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/18/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/18/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/18/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/18/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/18/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/18/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/18/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/18/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 04/18/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/18/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/18/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/18/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/23/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/23/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/23/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/23/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 05/23/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/23/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/28/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/28/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/28/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/28/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/25/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 07/25/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/25/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 08/04/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/04/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/04/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/19/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 10/10/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 10/22/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 10/22/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 12/04/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/07/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 02/07/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 02/07/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/09/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/03/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/12/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/08/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/15/2008
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/17/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/29/2008
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 11/20/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 11/20/2008