Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/06/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/06/2007
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 03/27/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/27/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/27/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/20/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/20/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/20/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/20/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/23/2007
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 05/03/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/05/2007
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 06/05/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/10/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/10/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/31/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/14/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 09/24/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/24/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/02/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 10/24/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/15/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/07/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/12/2008
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 02/27/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/29/2008
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 05/20/2008