There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Citizenship Reform Act of 2007

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Immigration and Nationality Act to deny citizenship at birth to children born in the United States of parents who are not citizens or permanent resident aliens.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/04/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
02/02/2007Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration, Citizenship, Refugees, Border Security, and International Law.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/05/2007Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E3-4)
Action By: House of Representatives
01/04/2007Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/04/2007Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 01/09/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 01/22/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 01/24/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/30/2007
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 03/06/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 09/24/2007

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary01/04/2007 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration, Citizenship, Refugees, Border Security, and International Law02/02/2007 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.133.


Subjects (12)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.133. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/04/2007)

Citizenship Reform Act of 2007 - Amends the Immigration and Nationality Act to limit automatic citizenship at birth to a child born in the United States who was born: (1) in wedlock in the United States to a parent who is a U.S. citizen or national or is an alien lawfully admitted for permanent residence who maintains such residence; (2) out of wedlock in the United States to a mother who is a U.S. citizen or national or is an alien lawfully admitted for permanent residence who maintains such residence; or (3) out of wedlock in the United States to a father who is a U.S. citizen or national or is an alien lawfully admitted for permanent residence who maintains such residence, but only if a blood relationship between the father and the child is established by clear and convincing evidence, the father had U.S. nationality or was a U.S. permanent resident at the time of the child's birth, the father (unless deceased) has agreed in writing to provide financial support for the child until the child reaches 18, and, while the child is under 18, the father either acknowledges paternity under oath or paternity is established in court.

Defines "born in wedlock" to exclude common law marriages.