Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/07/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 03/07/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/07/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/07/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/08/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/08/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/08/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/08/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/09/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/09/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/09/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 03/09/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 03/12/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/12/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/13/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/13/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 03/13/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/14/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/14/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/19/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/20/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/21/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/21/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/21/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 03/22/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 03/26/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/26/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/16/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/16/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/16/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/16/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/18/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/19/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/24/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/25/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/26/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/15/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/05/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/06/2007
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 07/16/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 10/16/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 01/15/2008