Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 03/06/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 03/06/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/06/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 03/06/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/06/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/23/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/23/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/23/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 03/23/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/23/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/23/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/23/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/23/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/23/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/23/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/23/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/23/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 03/23/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/19/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/19/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/19/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/19/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/19/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/19/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/19/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/19/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/19/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/19/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/19/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/19/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/19/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/19/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/24/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/24/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/24/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/24/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/24/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/24/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 04/24/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/26/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/26/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/16/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/16/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/16/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/16/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/24/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/24/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/18/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 06/18/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/31/2008