Committees: H.R.1333 — 110th Congress (2007-2008)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security03/06/2007 Referred to
05/20/2008 Markup by
06/05/2008 Reported by H. Rept. 110-691,Part 1
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Emergency Communications, Preparedness, and Response03/12/2007 Referred to
04/30/2008 Markup by
04/30/2008 Reported by
House Transportation and Infrastructure03/06/2007 Referred to
05/15/2008 Markup by
06/12/2008 Reported by H. Rept. 110-691,Part 2
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Aviation03/07/2007 Referred to
05/15/2008 Discharged from
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management03/07/2007 Referred to
05/15/2008 Discharged from
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs06/19/2008 Referred to