Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 03/06/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 03/06/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 03/06/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 03/06/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 03/06/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 03/06/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/09/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 03/09/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/09/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/14/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/21/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/21/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/21/2007
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 03/27/2007
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 03/27/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/17/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 04/25/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 04/25/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 04/25/2007
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 06/05/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/25/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 09/18/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 09/18/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 09/18/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/18/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 10/02/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 11/15/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 02/07/2008