Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/07/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/09/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/09/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/13/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 03/13/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 03/14/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/02/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 06/12/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 08/01/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/05/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 10/10/2007
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 02/25/2008