Committees: H.R.1343 — 110th Congress (2007-2008)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce03/06/2007 Referred to
05/07/2008 Markup by
06/04/2008 Reported by H. Rept. 110-680
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health03/07/2007 Referred to
12/04/2007 Hearings by
04/23/2008 Markup by
04/23/2008 Reported by
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions06/05/2008 Referred to
09/24/2008 Discharged from