Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 03/06/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/14/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 03/14/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/14/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/14/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/20/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/20/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/27/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 03/27/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 03/27/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/27/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/27/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/27/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/16/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/16/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/16/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/16/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 04/16/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/16/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/16/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/16/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/17/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/17/2007
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/17/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/20/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/20/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/23/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/23/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/23/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 04/26/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 04/26/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/26/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/01/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/01/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/01/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/01/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/01/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/02/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/07/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/10/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/10/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/14/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/14/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/16/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/21/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/21/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/05/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/18/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/18/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/18/2007