Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/06/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 03/06/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/06/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/06/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/06/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/21/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/21/2007
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/21/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/21/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/21/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/26/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/26/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/28/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/17/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/17/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/17/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/17/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/17/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/17/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/26/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 04/26/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/07/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/07/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/21/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/14/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/16/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 07/19/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/05/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/25/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/01/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 10/02/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 10/09/2007
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/01/2008