Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26]* 03/06/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/07/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/07/2007
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/07/2007
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 03/07/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/07/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/07/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 03/07/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/09/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/09/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/09/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/12/2007
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/12/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/12/2007
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 03/12/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/20/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 03/21/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/22/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 03/22/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 03/22/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/22/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/22/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/22/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/23/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/27/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/16/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/19/2007
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 04/24/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/24/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/01/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/03/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/21/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/13/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/15/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 07/30/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 07/31/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 10/02/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 10/03/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 11/14/2007
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 07/08/2008