Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/06/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/06/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/06/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 03/06/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 03/06/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/07/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/07/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/29/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/25/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/01/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/05/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/05/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/27/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/24/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/15/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/23/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 10/23/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/23/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/31/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/16/2008