Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 03/06/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/28/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/28/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/28/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/28/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/28/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 03/28/2007
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/28/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 03/28/2007
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 03/28/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/28/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/28/2007
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/28/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/28/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/28/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/28/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 03/28/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 03/28/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/28/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 05/09/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/09/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/09/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/09/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/09/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/13/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/13/2007
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 06/13/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/13/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/28/2007
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 06/28/2007
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 06/28/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/28/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/16/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/16/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 07/16/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/16/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 07/24/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/24/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/24/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 07/24/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 07/24/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 07/26/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 07/26/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 07/26/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 08/03/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 08/03/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 08/03/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 08/03/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 08/03/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 08/03/2007
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 08/03/2007
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 08/03/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 08/03/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/17/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/17/2007
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 09/17/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 09/17/2007
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 09/17/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/17/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 09/17/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/26/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 10/09/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/09/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 10/15/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 11/15/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 12/18/2007