Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/06/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/07/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 03/09/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/12/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/14/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 03/27/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 04/24/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/24/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/01/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/23/2007
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 08/01/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/07/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 10/25/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 12/04/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 12/04/2007
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 12/05/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 12/05/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 12/12/2007
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 12/12/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 12/12/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 12/12/2007
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 02/13/2008
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 02/25/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 03/05/2008
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 03/05/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 03/05/2008
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/05/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/31/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/04/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/09/2008
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/23/2008
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/24/2008
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 05/15/2008
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 06/03/2008
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/09/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/23/2008