Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 01/18/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 01/22/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 02/08/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 02/28/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/17/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/04/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/27/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/02/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 10/16/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 10/18/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 10/29/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 01/16/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 02/12/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/12/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 02/13/2008
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 02/25/2008
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 02/26/2008