Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/20/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/20/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/20/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/17/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/19/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/24/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/26/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/08/2008