Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 01/22/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 09/10/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/10/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 09/10/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 09/10/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/17/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/17/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/17/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 09/24/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/24/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/25/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/27/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 09/27/2007
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 10/01/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 10/01/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/02/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/02/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 10/03/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 10/03/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 10/04/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 10/09/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 10/09/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 10/10/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 10/10/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 10/10/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 10/15/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 10/16/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/17/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 10/18/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 10/18/2007
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 10/22/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 10/23/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 10/29/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 11/07/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 11/14/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 06/05/2008